+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.651
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Vote
March 14, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor