+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1150
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor