+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1304
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor