+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.153
- Delivered To Governor
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.483
- Substituted For A9175
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.57
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
January 20, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 4
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor