+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.6
- Delivered To Governor
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.29
- Substituted For A8745
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.42
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
January 18, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor