+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.288
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.461
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 769a
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
January 27, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
May 30, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor