+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.527
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
July 21, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
March 3, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor