+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.325
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.342
- Substituted For A9299
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1060
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor