+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8591
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.12
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7623a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1