+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1187
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Vote
June 3, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Transportation - Jun 3, 2014
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor