+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.290
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.405
- Substituted For A9853
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1301
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor