+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A9640a
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended (t) 7603a
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1237
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Vote
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor