+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.48
- Signed Chap.643
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.801
- Substituted For A1508
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1522
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
June 7, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21