+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.316
On September 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1019
- Substituted For A9664
On March 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.424
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor