+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a8922
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1028
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to social services
+ − Vote
May 29, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Social Services - May 29, 2014
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: nay
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor