+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.301
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.322
- Substituted For A9639
- Referred To Ways And Means
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1013
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
July 23, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
July 22, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor