+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.76
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.289
- Substituted For A9097
On February 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.428
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor