+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A10781a
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7521a
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1497
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor