+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.214
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.196
- Substituted For A10104a
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1650
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7513a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 1
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor