+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.918
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
April 26, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor