+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.567
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
February 28, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor