+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.272
On September 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.180
- Substituted For A10082b
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 7415c
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1322
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7415b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Judiciary
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7415a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 1