+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7406c
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7406b
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.869
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7406a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 21
April 26, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor