+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.487
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.334
- Substituted For A9859
On March 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.291
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
January 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor