+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to rules
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading cal.1618
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 7389a
- Amend and recommit to consumer protection
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to consumer protection
+ − Vote
June 19, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 19, 2014
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: present
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: present
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea