+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A627a
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 738a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.817
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor