+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.817
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7367a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor