+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8163a
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1769
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Codes
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7313a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
On August 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 3
May 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor