+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.595
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 731a
- Amend And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 4
March 11, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor