+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A10203
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1342
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor