+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.27
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.680
- Substituted For A8955
On February 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.34
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 2
January 8, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor