+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.21
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.613
- Substituted For A8918
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.25
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 8, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
January 8, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor