+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.768
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1431
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1