+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.645
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1214
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 13
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor