+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.343
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Ethics And Internal Governance
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
January 25, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Ethics And Internal Governance)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor