+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1326
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 726a
- Amend And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor