+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.206
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.249
- Substituted For A2698a
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1210
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 726a
- Amend And Recommit To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
June 6, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor