+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.435
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.150
- Substituted For A5511a
- Referred To Codes
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1721
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 10, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 15
June 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor