+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a9570b
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 7227b
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading (t) 7227a
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1034
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to education
+ − Vote
May 29, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Education - May 29, 2014
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor