+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A9696
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1579
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor