+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1284
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor