+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8821
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.581
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor