+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1130
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor