+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.34
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.563
- Substituted For A9773
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Tourism, Parks, Arts And Sports Development
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.615
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
April 12, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor