+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.76
- Delivered To Governor
On February 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.386
- Substituted For A9133
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.99
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor