+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8156b
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.723
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
May 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1