+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.762
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Vote
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor