+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a9735
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.782
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
+ − Vote
May 19, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Housing, Construction and Community Development - May 19, 2014
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: present
- Ruben Diaz: present
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor