+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.1
- Signed Chap.41
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.618
- Substituted For A9531
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.591
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor