+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.319
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.87
- Substituted For A9998
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.709
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor